EP4124898 - 3D INFRARED NIGHT VISION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaodi Digital (Qingdao) Co., Ltd. Middle End Of Landscape Avenue Jimo Provincial High Tech Industrial Development Zone Qingdao / CN | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Zhujun Qingdao / CN | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Lin Chien, Mon-Yin Gloria Fuertes 1, 2° D 28342 Valdemoro Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/05] | Lin Chien, Mon-Yin Gloria Fuertes 1, 2° D 28340 Valdemoro Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 22186210.5 | 21.07.2022 | [2023/05] | Priority number, date | CN202121736866U | 28.07.2021 Original published format: CN 202121736866 U | CN202110857327 | 28.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110857327 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4124898 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4124898 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/12 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
G02B23/12 (EP);
G02B30/26 (EP,US);
G02B23/18 (EP);
G02B25/001 (EP,US);
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0134 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3D-INFRAROT-NACHTSICHTGERÄT | [2023/05] | English: | 3D INFRARED NIGHT VISION DEVICE | [2023/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VISION NOCTURNE INFRAROUGE 3D | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN2048979U (ZHUANG GUOHUI [CN]) [Y] 7* abstract *; | [XYI]US2012098971 (HANSEN JOEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0020] - [0030] - [0038] - paragraphs [0045] , [0081]; figures 1,6 * [Y] 4,5,7 [I] 3,8,9; | [Y]CN103293685 (WANG LINGYU) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * |