EP4117141 - DEVICE TO BE CHARGED AND CHARGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Jialiang Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 02 /
Tian, Chen Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 03 /
Zhang, Jun Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 04 /
Chen, Shebiao Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 05 /
Wan, Shiming Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | 06 /
Li, Jiada Dongguan, Guangdong, 523860 / CN | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22186937.3 | 24.02.2017 | [2023/02] | Priority number, date | WO2016CN101944 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/101944 | WO2017CN73653 | 15.02.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/073653 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4117141 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4117141 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/04 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP,IL,US);
H01M10/4207 (CN,IL);
H02J7/0014 (IL,KR,US);
H02J7/0013 (CN,IL);
H02J7/0019 (IL,US);
H01M10/441 (CN,IL,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H02J7/00036 (IL,US);
H02J7/0024 (IL,US);
H02J7/0029 (IL);
H02J7/00302 (IL,US);
H02J7/00309 (CN,IL);
H02J7/0031 (IL,US);
H02J7/0068 (IL,US);
H02J7/007 (CN,IL);
H02J7/00712 (IL,US);
H02J7/00714 (EP,IL,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,CN,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2023/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZU LADENDE VORRICHTUNG UND LADEVERFAHREN | [2023/02] | English: | DEVICE TO BE CHARGED AND CHARGING METHOD | [2023/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CHARGER ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE | [2023/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 27.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17751226.6 / EP3340425 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2010123433 (GUO ZUFENG [CN]); | [YA]EP2538519 (LINEAR TECHN INC [US]); | [YA]EP2879266 (DIALOG SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH [DE]); | [Y]CN104993565 (QINGDAO HISENSE MOBILE COMM); | [YA]US2016064962 (HUANG DANIEL [US], et al); | [YA]WO2016074391 (GUANG DONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM CORP LTD [CN]); | [P]US2017040813 (HU ERMENG [CN], et al); | [P]EP3131170 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) |