EP4137430 - YARN PROCESSING FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg. 2-6-26, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Norihiro Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 22186945.6 | 26.07.2022 | [2023/08] | Priority number, date | JP20210135112 | 20.08.2021 Original published format: JP 2021135112 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137430 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H63/08, B65H67/02, B65H49/12 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B65H63/086 (EP);
B65H49/12 (EP);
B65H67/02 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2023/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARNVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE | [2023/08] | English: | YARN PROCESSING FACILITY | [2023/08] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE FIL | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019177108 (CHARLES EATON DAVID [GB], et al); | [A]EP3771677 (TMT MACHINERY INC [JP]) | by applicant | JPH06212521 | JP2002088605 | JP2003526584 | JP5873105B |