EP4098562 - SYSTEM FOR INVENTORY MANAGEMENT OF ON-BOARD REFRESHMENTS FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISS, Matthias 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Michael 21129 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
KAUFELD, Norbert 21129 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
DAHMS, Tobias 21129 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
HOELSCHER, Heinrich 21129 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
MORTENSEN ERNITS, Rafael 28209 Bremen / DE | 07 /
FREITAG, Michael 28719 Bremen / DE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22187185.8 | 01.04.2019 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | DE201810205289 | 09.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018205289 | [2022/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098562 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4098562 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D11/04, G06Q10/08, G06Q50/12, G06Q10/087 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B64D11/0007 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,CN,US);
B64D11/04 (EP,CN,US);
B65G1/0492 (US);
G06Q50/12 (EP);
B65G2201/0202 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | B64D11/00, B64D11/04, G06Q10/08, G06Q50/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BESTANDSFÜHRUNG EINER BORDVERPFLEGUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/49] | English: | SYSTEM FOR INVENTORY MANAGEMENT OF ON-BOARD REFRESHMENTS FOR A VEHICLE | [2022/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'INVENTAIRE D'UNE PRISE EN CHARGE À BORD D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19166466.3 / EP3552962 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102007007717 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]); | [A]US2009112377 (SCHALLA JAMES P [US], et al); | [A]US2011238742 (BIRKMANN TIMOTHY A [US], et al); | [A]DE102010027709 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2015057796 (BOODAGHIANS LILLIAN [US]) | by applicant | DE102009058327 |