EP4297102 - SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE, SOLAR CELL, AND PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Jinko Solar Co., Ltd. No. 58, Yuan Xi Road Yuan Hua Town Haining, Zhejiang 314416 / CN | For all designated states JINKO SOLAR CO., LTD No. 1 Jinko Road Shangrao Economic Development Zone Jiangxi 334100 / CN | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Huimin HAINING, 314416 / CN | 02 /
XU, Menglei HAINING, 314416 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Jie HAINING, 314416 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Xinyu HAINING, 314416 / CN | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22187232.8 | 27.07.2022 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | CN202210704732 | 21.06.2022 Original published format: CN202210704732 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297102 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0236, H01L31/0747, H01L31/18 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01L31/02363 (EP,CN);
H01L31/02366 (US);
H01L31/02167 (CN);
H01L31/02168 (US);
H01L31/022441 (CN);
H01L31/03529 (US);
H01L31/03682 (US);
H01L31/0516 (CN,US);
H01L31/068 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSUBSTRAT, SOLARZELLE UND PHOTOVOLTAISCHES MODUL | [2023/52] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE, SOLAR CELL, AND PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE | [2023/52] | French: | SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, CELLULE SOLAIRE ET MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN113224202 (ZHEJIANG AIKO SOLAR ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP7082235B (ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |