EP4119563 - MACROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President And Fellows Of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | For all designated states President And Fellows Of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Yoshito Cambridge, MA 02142-1233 / US | 02 /
KIRA, Kazunobu Ibaraki Tsukuba-shi, 300-2635 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Ken Ibaraki Tsukuba-shi, 300-2635 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22187494.4 | 03.04.2018 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | US201762482030P | 05.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762482030 P | US201762526677P | 29.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762526677 P | US201715814105 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: US201715814105 | US201762586416P | 15.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762586416 P | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4119563 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4119563 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/22, A61P35/00, A61K31/357 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C07D493/22 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/35 (IL,KR);
A61K31/357 (IL,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,IL);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/04 (CN);
C07D309/04 (KR);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAKROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/03] | English: | MACROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND USES THEREOF | [2023/03] | French: | COMPOSÉ MACROCYCLIQUE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18719390.9 / EP3606928 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006104984 (LITTLEFIELD BRUCE A [US], et al); | US9938288 [ ] (KISHI YOSHITO [US], et al); | [E]WO2019099646 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9317690 | US5338865 | US5436238 | US5786492 | WO9965894 | WO2005118565 | WO2006076100 | WO2007139149 | WO2009046308 | WO2009064029 | WO2009124237 | US7982060 | WO2011094339 | US8093410 | US8203010 | WO2012147900 | US8350067 | US8445701 | WO2013142999 | US8598373 | US8618313 | US8884031 | USRE45324E | US8927597 | WO2015000070 | US8975422 | US8987479 | WO2015066729 | WO2015085193 | US9206194 | WO2016003975 | US9278979 | WO2016038624 | US9303050 | US9303039 | US9382262 | US9469651 | WO2016176560 | WO2016179607 |