EP4124433 - ENGRAVING DEVICE FOR RELATIVELY FRAGILE MATERIAL SLABS AND ENGRAVING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donatoni, Giorgio Via Don Martini 1 37010 Cavaion Veronese (VR) / IT | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Viale Roma, 3 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 22187564.4 | 28.07.2022 | [2023/05] | Priority number, date | IT20210020618 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: IT202100020618 | [2023/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124433 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/00, B28D1/04, B28D1/22, B28D7/00 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
B28D1/043 (EP);
B28D1/003 (EP);
B28D1/225 (EP);
B28D7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRAVURVORRICHTUNG FÜR RELATIV ZERBRECHLICHE MATERIALPLATTEN UND GRAVURVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/05] | English: | ENGRAVING DEVICE FOR RELATIVELY FRAGILE MATERIAL SLABS AND ENGRAVING METHOD THEREOF | [2023/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GRAVURE POUR DALLES DE MATÉRIAUX RELATIVEMENT FRAGILES ET PROCÉDÉ DE GRAVURE ASSOCIÉ | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 26.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1700677 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0017] , [0018] , [0036] , [0073] * * figures 1,2a,3,4,9,13,15,17 *; | [A]WO2015159270 (TONCELLI DARIO [IT]) [A] 1-13 * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 7 ** figures 1,2,4,5,9 *; | [Y]JP2015223819 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP3603913 (DONATONI GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0041] , [0049] , [0069] , [0071] , [0072] , [0092] * * figures 1-4,6,9,10 *; | [Y]CN112519006 (FOSHAN SHENCHUANG ELECTROMECHANICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0034] - [0038] * * figures 1-3 * |