EP4140447 - POSITION-ADJUSTABLE DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF TRICUSPID REGURGITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tau Medical Inc. A3, 68 Busandaehak-ro 50beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan / KR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, June-hong 48516 Busan / KR | 02 /
PARK, Kyone Peter 50653 Yangsan / KR | 03 /
CHON, Min Ku 50658 Yangsan-si / KR | 04 /
CURLEY, Jimmy 50658 Yangsan-si / KR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 22188234.3 | 17.01.2020 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | KR20190006359 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190006359 | KR20190055911 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190055911 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140447 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/2466 (EP);
A61F2/246 (EP,CN);
A61B17/1204 (US);
A61B17/00 (CN);
A61B17/12109 (US);
A61B17/12122 (US);
A61B17/1214 (US);
A61M25/0147 (US);
A61B17/12013 (US);
A61B2017/00243 (US);
A61B2017/00783 (US);
A61B2017/00796 (CN);
A61B2017/0243 (US);
A61B2017/1205 (US);
A61F2/2427 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | LAGEVERÄNDERLICHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TRIKUSPIDALREGURGITATION | [2023/09] | English: | POSITION-ADJUSTABLE DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF TRICUSPID REGURGITATION | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF À POSITION RÉGLABLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA RÉGURGITATION TRICUSPIDIENNE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20152497.2 / EP3682852 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016213472 (KIM JUNE-HONG [KR]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0078] - [0085]; figures 14A-15B *; | [A]US2017266413 (KHUU BAO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0063]; figures 20,21 *; | [A]US2018049873 (MANASH BOAZ [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0188] - [0190]; figure 25 *; | [A]WO2018143560 (TAUPNU MEDICAL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0061] - [0075]; figures 1-4B * | by applicant | US7854762 | US8486136 | US9474605 |