EP4319272 - IMPROVED DATA PACKET TRANSMISSION EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group Services Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury RG14 2FN / GB | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORRALL, Chandrika London, W2 6BY / GB | 02 /
KULAKOV, Alexey London, W2 6BY / GB | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22188831.6 | 04.08.2022 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319272 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04W28/0268 (EP,US);
H04L1/188 (CN);
H04L1/1887 (CN);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W28/0252 (EP,US);
H04W28/0231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE DATENPAKETÜBERTRAGUNGSEFFIZIENZ | [2024/06] | English: | IMPROVED DATA PACKET TRANSMISSION EFFICIENCY | [2024/06] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE L'EFFICACITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DES PAQUETS DE DONNÉES | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 02.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2020100156 (LIU FEILU [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,12-15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084]; figure 7A * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0094]; figure 8 * [Y] 3-5,7,8,10,11; | [Y]EP3694280 (COMCAST CABLE COMM LLC [US]) [Y] 3-5,7,8 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0134]; figures 16A, 16B, 16C *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on XR (Extended Reality) and media services (Release 18)", no. V0.3.0, (20220531), pages 1 - 216, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL REPORT; 3GPP TR 23.700-60, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/23_series/23.700-60/23700-60-030.zip 23700-60-030_rm.docx, (20220531), XP052182635 [Y] 10,11 * page 20; sequence 5.5 * * page 59 - page 60; sequence 6.10 * |