EP4145118 - METHOD FOR EVALUATION OF CHEMICAL BOND PRESENCE OR ABSENCE BY MULTIDIMENSIONAL NMR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUCHI, Masashi Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
KITAURA, Takehiro Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Hiroaki Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22188930.6 | 05.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | JP20210143181 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021143181 | JP20220095163 | 13.06.2022 Original published format: JP 2022095163 | JP20220109025 | 06.07.2022 Original published format: JP 2022109025 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145118 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01R33/46, // C08K3/36, C08K5/548 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G01R33/4633 (EP);
G01N24/08 (US);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
G01N24/088 (EP);
G01N33/445 (US);
C08K5/548 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ANWESENHEIT ODER ABWESENHEIT EINER CHEMISCHEN BINDUNG MITTELS MEHRDIMENSIONALER NMR | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATION OF CHEMICAL BOND PRESENCE OR ABSENCE BY MULTIDIMENSIONAL NMR | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PRÉSENCE OU D'ABSENCE DE LIAISON CHIMIQUE PAR RMN MULTIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 19.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11281598 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * [A] 4,5; | [XDA]JP2006337342 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [XD] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4,5; | [XA]JP2013108845 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4,5; | [XA] - LEE DANIEL ET AL, "Untangling the Condensation Network of Organosiloxanes on Nanoparticles using 2D 29 Si- 29 Si Solid-State NMR Enhanced by Dynamic Nuclear Polarization", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20140825), vol. 136, no. 39, doi:10.1021/ja506688m, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13781 - 13788, XP093009133 [X] 1,3-5 * pages 13781,13782 and 13785-13787;; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja506688m | by applicant | JP2006337342 | JP2010216952 | - UDO GOERL et al., "Investigations Into The Silica/Silane Reaction System", Rubber Chemistry And Technology, (19970000), vol. 70, pages 608 - 623, XP000750538 |