Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4319454 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4319454



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(21)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
18.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
18.07.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
18.07.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
18.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.02.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.01.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.02.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.02.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 6
10.02.2023 European search report Search / examination 1
10.02.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
22.01.2023 Search started Search / examination 1
05.08.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.08.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.08.2022 Claims Search / examination 2
05.08.2022 Description Search / examination 17
05.08.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2022 Drawings Search / examination 9
05.08.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5