EP4137885 - LIGHT CONVERSION SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Lighting Systems, Inc. 3445 S. 5th St., Suite 180 Phoenix, AZ 85040-1169 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GULER, Urcan Avon, CT / US | 02 /
PEARSON, Matthew R. Hartford, CT / US | 03 /
MANTESE, Joseph V. Ellington, CT / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 22189331.6 | 08.08.2022 | [2023/08] | Priority number, date | US202117406950 | 19.08.2021 Original published format: US202117406950 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137885 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/35, A61N5/00, G02F1/37 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G02F1/353 (EP);
G02F1/397 (US);
A61L2/084 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
G02F1/3507 (US);
G02F1/3532 (EP);
G02F1/37 (EP);
A61L2/08 (US);
A61L2/10 (EP);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
G02F2202/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/08] | English: | LIGHT CONVERSION SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND DEVICES | [2023/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE CONVERSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6414780 (D AGUANNO GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 35 *; | [A]US6538794 (D AGUANNO GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 6, lines 35-67 *; | [Y]EP2302449 (DRAKA COMTEQ BV [NL]) [Y] 6,7,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] *; | [YA]US2017290932 (MORI JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] * [A] 1-5; | [YA]EP3861404 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0087] - [0092] - [0230] - [0238] * [A] 1-5; | [A] - ALEXANDER K POPOV ET AL, "Merging Nonlinear Optics and Negative-Index Metamaterials", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20110803), doi:10.1117/12.896526, XP080519065 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.896526 |