EP4140461 - TRANSFER MATTRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GBUK Group Limited Woodland House Blackwood Hall Business Park North Duffield Selby, North Yorkshire YO8 5DD / GB | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states GBUK Group Limited Woodland House Blackwood Hall Business Park North Duffield Selby, North Yorkshire YO8 5DD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWAN, Joseph Selby, YO8 5DD / GB | 02 /
ALLSOPP, Ross Selby, YO8 5DD / GB | 03 /
SCARD, Nicholas Selby, YO8 5DD / GB | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/09] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22189406.6 | 09.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | GB20210012188 | 25.08.2021 Original published format: GB 202112188 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140461 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4140461 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057, A61G7/10 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61G7/057 (EP);
A61G7/1026 (EP,GB);
A61G7/103 (US);
A61G7/1021 (GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSMATRATZE | [2023/09] | English: | TRANSFER MATTRESS | [2023/09] | French: | MATELAS DE TRANSFERT | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5807290 (BARRY THOMAS [GB]); | [A]US2011271444 (DAVIS NICHOLAS JOHN STRATTON [GB]); | [XAI]US2013212806 (COPPENS DANIEL D [US], et al); | [XI]US2019083341 (ULREICH DANIEL R [US], et al); | [XAI]CN213311154U (WEI BAOFU, et al) | by applicant | EP2148593 | EP1942772 |