EP4120264 - IMPROVED SUBBAND BLOCK BASED HARMONIC TRANSPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLEMOES, Lars 113 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22189443.9 | 05.01.2011 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | US201029624110P | 19.01.2010 Original published format: US 29624110 P | US201033154510P | 05.05.2010 Original published format: US 33154510 P | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120264 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4120264 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/04, G10L19/022, G10L25/18, G10L21/038, G10L19/02 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/022 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/032 (KR,US);
G10L21/02 (KR);
G10L21/04 (EP,KR,US);
G10L25/18 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BLOCK-BASIERTE HARMONISCHE TEILBAND-TRANSPOSITION | [2023/21] | English: | IMPROVED SUBBAND BLOCK BASED HARMONIC TRANSPOSITION | [2023/03] | French: | TRANSPOSITION HARMONIQUE AMELIORIÉ EN SOUS-BANDE À BASE DE BLOCS | [2023/21] |
Former [2023/03] | VERBESSERTE SUBBANDBLOCKBASIERTE HARMONISCHE TRANSPOSITION | ||
Former [2023/03] | TRANSPOSITION HARMONIQUE À BASE DE BLOC DE SOUS-BANDE AMÉLIORÉ | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11700033.1 / EP2526550 | EP19175682.4 / EP3564955 | EP20206463.0 / EP3806096 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/37] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SI | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9857436 (LILJERYD LARS GUSTAF [SE], et al); | by applicant | WO9857436 | WO02052545 |