EP4141240 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHODS FOR ENABLING OPTIMISATION OF DERATE FOR A PROPULSION SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wall, Derek Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Mills, Andrew Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Beecroft, Peter Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 04 /
Bacic, Marko Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 05 /
Guicherd, Romain Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 22189625.1 | 10.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | GB20210012168 | 25.08.2021 Original published format: GB 202112168 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141240 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/18, F02C9/28, F02C9/52 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
F02C9/28 (EP);
F02C9/00 (GB);
G08G5/0065 (US);
B64D31/00 (GB);
F02C9/18 (EP);
F02C9/52 (EP);
G01M15/14 (GB);
G08G5/003 (US);
F05D2260/81 (EP);
F05D2270/71 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTE VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER HERABSETZUNG FÜR EIN ANTRIEBSSYSTEM EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2023/09] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHODS FOR ENABLING OPTIMISATION OF DERATE FOR A PROPULSION SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS MIS EN UVRE PAR ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER LE DÉCLASSEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION D'UN VÉHICULE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015285159 (BELGHAGI HICHEM [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0119] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2018238243 (POTH JR STEFAN M [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]US2020307831 (HUYNH KIET T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,11,13-15 * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0218] * * paragraph [0016] * |