EP4110000 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL USING BASIC SERVICE SET IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION DETERMINATION OF RECEIVED FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilus Institute of Standards and Technology Inc. 5F, 216 Hwangsaeul-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | For all designated states SK Telecom Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower 65 Eulji-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04539 / KR | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Geonjung Gyeonggi-do 16547 / KR | 02 /
SON, Juhyung Gyeonggi-do 16024 / KR | 03 /
KWAK, Jinsam Gyeonggi-do 16021 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Woojin Gyeonggi-do 14038 / KR | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/52] | 01 /
KO, Geonjung 16547 Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
SON, Juhyung 16024 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
KWAK, Jinsam 16021 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
AHN, Woojin 14038 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22190161.4 | 03.04.2017 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | KR20160040551 | 02.04.2016 Original published format: KR 20160040551 | KR20160093812 | 23.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160093812 | KR20160102229 | 11.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160102229 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110000 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4110000 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W84/12 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP,US);
H04W74/0808 (CN,KR);
H04L12/28 (US);
H04W74/002 (KR);
H04W76/11 (CN,KR);
H04W84/12 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT MIT VERWENDUNG VON BESTIMMUNG VON BASISDIENSTSATZIDENTIFIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN EINES EMPFANGENEN FRAMES | [2022/52] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL USING BASIC SERVICE SET IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION DETERMINATION OF RECEIVED FRAME | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL FAISANT APPEL À UNE DÉTERMINATION D'INFORMATIONS D'IDENTIFICATION D'ENSEMBLE DE SERVICES DE BASE D'UNE TRAME REÇUE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 27.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17775954.5 / EP3439417 | EP21162615.5 / EP3852480 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Wilus Institute of Standards and Technology Inc. 5F, 216 Hwangsaeul-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13595 / KR | Date: | 21.04.2023 | [2023/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015050311 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]WO2015093704 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [P]EP3054736 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [P]EP3086484 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | by applicant | KR20160040551 | KR20160093812 | KR20160102229 |