EP4322460 - RELIABILITY SETTING FOR IMPROVED SECURITY ESTABLISHMENT METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia Morchon, Oscar Eindhoven / NL | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22190168.9 | 12.08.2022 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322460 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04L9/40, H04W12/00, G16Y30/10, H04L9/14, H04W12/041 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04L9/0844 (EP);
G16Y30/10 (EP);
H04L63/06 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L63/0838 (EP);
H04L63/0869 (EP);
H04L63/0876 (EP);
H04L63/205 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (EP);
H04L9/0863 (EP);
H04L9/0866 (EP);
H04L9/0869 (EP);
H04L9/14 (EP);
H04L9/3273 (EP);
H04W12/009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUVERLÄSSIGKEITSEINSTELLUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE SICHERHEITSAUFBAUMETHODEN UND -SYSTEME | [2024/07] | English: | RELIABILITY SETTING FOR IMPROVED SECURITY ESTABLISHMENT METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2024/07] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE FIABILITÉ POUR PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE SÉCURITÉ AMÉLIORÉS | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017041669 (DING JINTAI [CN]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [01.1] - paragraph [01.2] * * figure 2 *; | [XY] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Security issues to support Proximity Services (ProSe) (Release 13)", (20150828), 3GPP DRAFT; S3-152079_TR33.833V1_5_0_CL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG3_Security/TSGS3_80_Tallinn/Docs/, (20150828), XP051036037 [X] 1-6,8-17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * [Y] 7 | [Y] - BOURDREZ H KRAWCZYK ALGORAND FOUNDATION K LEWI NOVI RESEARCH C A WOOD CLOUDFLARE D ET AL, "The OPAQUE Asymmetric PAKE Protocol draft-irtf-cfrg-opaque-09; draft-irtf-cfrg-opaque-09.txt", no. 9, (20220706), pages 1 - 70, THE OPAQUE ASYMMETRIC PAKE PROTOCOL DRAFT-IRTF-CFRG-OPAQUE-09; DRAFT-IRTF-CFRG-OPAQUE-09.TXT; INTERNET-DRAFT: NETWORK WORKING GROUP, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERN, URL: https://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-irtf-cfrg-opaque-09, (20220706), XP015152645 [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0010] * | [A] - PETER SCHWABE ET AL, "Post-quantum TLS without handshake signatures", vol. 20220315:090704, (20220315), pages 1 - 26, IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, URL: https://eprint.iacr.org/2020/534.pdf, (20220315), XP061070780 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * figure 4 * | [A] - TURAN M S ET AL, "Recommendation for password-based key derivation : part 1: storage applications NIST SP 800-132", doi:10.6028/NIST.SP.800-132, (20101231), pages 1 - 18, NIST, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY (NIST), URL: https://nvlpubs.nist.gov/nistpubs/Legacy/SP/nistspecialpublication800-132.pdf, (20101231), XP061057701 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.6028/NIST.SP.800-132 | [A] - XINWEI GAO ET AL, "Efficient Implementation of Password-Based Authenticated Key Exchange from RLWE and Post-Quantum TLS", vol. 20171218:192844, (20171214), pages 1 - 8, IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, URL: http://eprint.iacr.org/2017/1192.pdf, (20171214), XP061023959 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * | [A] - STEBILA UNIVERSITY OF WATERLOO S GUERON U HAIFA D ET AL, "Design issues for hybrid key exchange in TLS 1.3; draft-stebila-tls-hybrid-design-00.txt", (20190311), pages 1 - 22, DESIGN ISSUES FOR HYBRID KEY EXCHANGE IN TLS 1.3; DRAFT-STEBILA-TLS-HYBRID-DESIGN-00.TXT; INTERNET-DRAFT: NETWORK WORKING GROUP, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET S, URL: https://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-stebila-tls-hybrid-design-00, (20190311), XP015131953 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0003] * | [A] - DONGQING XU ET AL, "Provably Secure Three-party Password Authenticated Key Exchange Protocol Based On Ring Learning With Error", IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (20170421), vol. 20170426:173311, pages 1 - 25, XP061023122 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0004] * | [T] - TJHAI M TOMLINSON POST-QUANTUM G BARTLETT QUANTUM SECRET S FLUHRER CISCO SYSTEMS D VAN GEEST ISARA CORPORATION O GARCIA-MORCHON PH, "Multiple Key Exchanges in IKEv2 draft-ietf-ipsecme-ikev2-multiple-ke-06; draft-ietf-ipsecme-ikev2-multiple-ke-06.txt", no. 6, (20220613), pages 1 - 33, MULTIPLE KEY EXCHANGES IN IKEV2 DRAFT-IETF-IPSECME-IKEV2-MULTIPLE-KE-06; DRAFT-IETF-IPSECME-IKEV2-MULTIPLE-KE-06.TXT; INTERNET-DRAFT: INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE (IETF), INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK, URL: https://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-ietf-ipsecme-ikev2-multiple-ke-06, (20220613), XP015152259 [T] * paragraph [0003] * | by applicant | - MELTEM SONMEZ TURAN et al., "Recommendation for Password-Based Key Derivation, Part 1: Storage Applications", NIST Special Publication, (20101200), pages 800 - 132 | - OLEG TARASKIN et al., Towards Isogeny-Based Password-Authenticated Key Establishment | - XINWEI GAO et al., Efficient Implementation of Password-Based Authenticated Key Exchange from RLWE and Post-Quantum TL.S | - TAUBERT, T. et al., SPAKE2+, an Augmented PAKE (Draft) |