EP4325425 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DEFINING AN OUTLINE OF A REGION IN AN IMAGE HAVING DISTORTED LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis AB Gränden 1 223 69 Lund / SE | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuan, Song 223 69 LUND / SE | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22190416.2 | 15.08.2022 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325425 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4325425 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/00, G06T5/00, H04N7/18 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G06T3/047 (EP,US);
G06V10/44 (CN);
G06T11/203 (US);
G06T15/00 (US);
G06T5/80 (EP);
G06T7/12 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP);
G06T2210/12 (US);
H04N7/183 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM DEFINIEREN EINES UMRISSES EINES BEREICHS IN EINEM BILD MIT VERZERRTEN LINIEN | [2024/08] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DEFINING AN OUTLINE OF A REGION IN AN IMAGE HAVING DISTORTED LINES | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE DÉFINIR UN CONTOUR D'UNE RÉGION DANS UNE IMAGE AYANT DES LIGNES DISTORDUES | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012169842 (CHUANG DANIEL B [US], et al); | [A]US2014340513 (NAGATA KAZUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015016746 (TSUBOTA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) |