Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.03.2025 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.11.2024 | First examination report | |
28.11.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.02.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
19.08.2022 | Change - representative | |
19.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |