EP4156890 - PIEZOELECTRIC LAMINATE AND PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Hiroyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, No. 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Seigo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, No. 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 22191046.6 | 18.08.2022 | [2023/13] | Priority number, date | JP20210157102 | 27.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021157102 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156890 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4156890 | Date: | 06.11.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10N30/87, H10N30/85, H10N30/853, H10N30/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
H10N30/704 (EP);
H10N30/85 (US);
H10N30/50 (US);
H10N30/8554 (EP);
H10N30/877 (EP,US);
H10N30/06 (EP);
H10N30/076 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHES LAMINAT UND PIEZOELEKTRISCHES ELEMENT | [2023/13] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC LAMINATE AND PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT | [2023/13] | French: | STRATIFIÉ PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 11.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1560278 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [X]US2007040198 (MATSUURA OSAMU [JP]); | [X]US2018138393 (SUMI KOJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2009070955 | JP2010056426 | WO2016051644 | JP2018082052 |