EP4324941 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TUBULAR SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Steel/Tube GmbH & Co. KG Residenzstraße 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2024/19] |
Former [2024/08] | For all designated states Benteler Steel/Tube GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Runschke, Anton 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Halfpap, Christopher 33106 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
Sasse, Daniel 46569 Hünxe / DE | 04 /
Brabander, Helwig 33154 Salzkotten / DE | 05 /
Mehren, Bernd 47249 Duisburg / DE | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22191218.1 | 19.08.2022 | [2024/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324941 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/10, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C21D8/105 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHRFÖRMIGEN HALBZEUGS | [2024/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TUBULAR SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT SEMI-FINI TUBULAIRE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 15.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000034538 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1264912 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP2006396 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2135962 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1264912 |