EP4123865 - ARC RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Bernd 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 02 /
Fasthuber, Christian 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 03 /
Fischereder, Franz 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 04 /
Breuer, Stefan 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 05 /
Spitzer, Walter 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 06 /
Bairhuber, Mario 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 07 /
Pfeil, Reimar 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22191931.9 | 26.07.2019 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | EP20180186047 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18186047 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123865 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02J13/00, H02J1/06, H02H1/00 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H02J1/06 (EP,CN,US);
H02H1/0015 (EP,CN,US);
H02H1/0076 (EP,CN,US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,CN,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E40/70 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/123 (EP);
Y04S10/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTBOGENERKENNUNG | [2023/04] | English: | ARC RECOGNITION | [2023/04] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'UN ARC ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 20.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19742398.1 / EP3830922 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5459630 (MACKENZIE RAYMOND W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2013009483 (KAWATE KEITH W [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0088] *; | [XAY]DE102016119877 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0023] , [0036] - [0039] - [0044]; figures 2a, 2b, 5a * [A] 9 [Y] 10; | [Y]EP3349317 (SOLAREDGE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0131] , [0132]; figures 8a,8c * | by applicant | US2013009483 | US2014084942 | WO2017149038 |