EP4141188 - SKYLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energy Saving Lucernari S.r.l. Via Trieste, 569 24033 Calusco d'Adda / IT | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISONE, Salvatore Virgilio 24033 Calusco d'Adda / IT | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 22192070.5 | 25.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | IT20210022571 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: IT202100022571 | [2023/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141188 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/03, E04D13/035 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
E04D13/035 (EP);
E04D13/0351 (EP);
E04D13/0352 (EP);
E04D13/0335 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERLICHT | [2023/09] | English: | SKYLIGHT | [2023/09] | French: | LUCARNE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8191317 (LUNDSGAARD CHRISTIAN AAGE [DK], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 10 *; | [XI]WO2021156313 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,5,9 * page 7, lines 16-28 * * page 32, line 21 * * figures 4-7 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10 | by applicant | US6089973 | JP2003009677 | EP1281314 | FR2846487 |