Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.01.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
27.01.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
29.08.2022 | Change - representative |