EP4144779 - XYLYLENE DIISOCYANATE COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK pucore co., ltd. (Gosa-dong) 255, Yongjam-ro Nam-gu, Ulsan, 44782 / KR | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states SKC Co., Ltd. 84, Jangan-ro 309beon-gil Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAI, Jae Young 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jeong Moo 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
HAN, Hyuk Hee 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
YOU, Kyeong Hwan 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 05 /
MYUNG, Jung Hwan 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Eui Jun 16338 Suwon-si / KR | 07 /
SHIN, Jung Hwan 16338 Suwon-si / KR | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22192441.8 | 26.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | KR20210116828 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210116828 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144779 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/24, C08G18/38, C08G18/76, G02C7/04 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
C07C265/14 (US);
C08G18/242 (US);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/3876 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (US);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/095 (US);
C08K5/521 (US);
C08K2003/329 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | XYLYLENDIISOCYANATZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND OPTISCHE POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2023/10] | English: | XYLYLENE DIISOCYANATE COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION INCLUDING THE SAME | [2023/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DIISOCYANATE XYLYLÈNE ET COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE LA COMPRENANT | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 13.07.2023 | Observations by third parties | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2006273717 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1,6,11,13-15 * paragraph [0045]; example 5 * [I] 2-5,7-12; | [X]JP2019059823 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1,6* paragraph [0150]; table 1 * | by applicant | KR20120076329 | other | JP2006273717 | KR101842254B | KR101954346B |