EP4144713 - LOCALIZED PVB BASED TACKIFIER APPLICATION FOR CMC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
READ, Kathryn S. Marlborough, 06447 / US | 02 /
RIEHL, John D. Hebron, 06248 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22192489.7 | 26.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | US202117460686 | 30.08.2021 Original published format: US202117460686 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144713 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/628, C04B35/638, C04B35/80, C04B35/626, C04B35/634 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C04B35/6264 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/62863 (US);
C04B35/6342 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (US);
C04B2235/5244 (EP);
C04B2235/5252 (EP);
C04B2235/5256 (US);
C04B2235/606 (EP);
C04B2235/614 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (EP,US);
C04B2235/658 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LOKALISIERTE PVB-BASIERTE KLEBRIGMACHERANWENDUNG FÜR CMC | [2023/10] | English: | LOCALIZED PVB BASED TACKIFIER APPLICATION FOR CMC | [2023/10] | French: | APPLICATION LOCALISÉE D'AGENT POISSEUX À BASE DE PVB POUR CMC | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4396663 (MITCHELL ROBERT W, et al) [Y] 2,3 * example 1 *; | [X]US5067998 (SINGH RAJ N [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,13 * example 1; claims 1,7 *; | [Y]US2016031762 (MATSUMOTO ROGER LEE KEN [US]) [Y] 2-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0018] *; | [XY]US2017320785 (MATSUMOTO ROGER LEE KEN [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0054] * [Y] 2-6,10; | [Y]US2018061572 (KANO YUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0071] - [0078] *; | [Y]US2019161413 (JACKSON R WESLEY [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0028] * |