Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
03.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.02.2024 | First examination report | |
20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
19.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
17.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
17.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
29.08.2022 | Change - representative |