Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12067192 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2023325025 | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | US202318207511 | 08.06.2023 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 | US202217866058 | 15.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230055322 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11816282 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2023116927 | 20.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7473609B | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B2 | JP2023060813 | 28.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115993900 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4167062 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI838867B | 11.04.2024 | B | TW202318171 | 01.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210138187 | 18.10.2021 | KR20210189671 | 28.12.2021 |