EP4332441 - FILTER ASSEMBLY AND COMBINATION APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AKTIEBOLAG S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEYH, Björn 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 02 /
PUOTI, Eduardo 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 03 /
PALLANTE, Valerio 47100 Forli / IT | 04 /
LEO, Orlando 47122 Forli / IT | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22192798.1 | 30.08.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332441 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
F24C15/2042 (EP);
F24C15/2035 (EP);
B01D46/0005 (EP);
B01D46/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERANORDNUNG UND KOMBINATIONSGERÄT | [2024/10] | English: | FILTER ASSEMBLY AND COMBINATION APPLIANCE | [2024/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE FILTRE ET APPAREIL COMBINÉ | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4610705 (SARNOSKY JOSEPH R [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 42-49; figure 3 *; | [A]DE9311478U (BHL BLECHBEARBEITUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10126842 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009]; claim 9 *; | [XY]DE102008014283 (BLANCO CS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-11,13,17 * paragraphs [0027] , [0088] - [0091]; figures 9-15 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,12; | [A]WO2013156898 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102013212921 (BSH BOSCH & SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] *; | [A]CN107567349 (SALPIETRA JORDAN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN108348831 (BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH CO KG) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0070] *; | [Y]AU2017281474 (BRUCKBAUER WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 12 * page 24, paragraph 2 - page 32, paragraph 6 *; | [X]CN111853884 (NINGBO FOTILE KITCHEN WARE CO) [X] 1 * claim 7 *; | [Y]US10953357 (JEONG HYUN-KU [KR], et al) [Y] 4,6,7 * column 6, lines 53-58; figure 3A *; | [X]WO2022028724 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) [X] 14-17* page 14, paragraph 3; figures 1,4,5 * | by applicant | WO2022028724 |