EP4140869 - THREE-WHEEL MOTOR VEHICLE AND CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rea, Eric 624 Red Robin Road Seffner, FL 33584 / US | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 22192989.6 | 30.08.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | US202117460515 | 30.08.2021 Original published format: US202117460515 | US202117468039 | 07.09.2021 Original published format: US202117468039 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140869 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/10, B62K5/025 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B62K5/025 (EP);
B62K5/05 (EP);
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62K5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIRÄDRIGES KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/09] | English: | THREE-WHEEL MOTOR VEHICLE AND CONTROL SYSTEM | [2023/09] | French: | VÉHICULE À TROIS ROUES ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003102176 (BAUTISTA ERIC SAQUETON [US]) [Y] 1,2,7-10 * abstract *; | [XAY]JP2012081784 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 18 * abstract * [A] 11 [Y] 1,2,7-10; | [XA]US2019144035 (DOERKSEN KYLE JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 18 * abstract *[A] 1,11 | by applicant | US10435104 |