EP4332901 - LOCALIZING AN AUGMENTED REALITY DEVICE USING A SINGLE IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labisch, Daniel 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Lehrbaum, Valeriya 80804 München / DE | 03 /
MacWilliams, Asa 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 04 /
Scherer, Tim 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
Sudharsan, Nischita 82131 Gauting / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22193150.4 | 31.08.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332901 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06T19/00, G06V20/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/75 (EP);
G06T19/006 (EP);
G06T19/20 (EP);
G06V20/20 (EP);
G06V20/62 (EP);
G06T2207/10004 (EP);
G06T2207/20092 (EP);
G06T2207/30164 (EP);
G06T2207/30204 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LOKALISIERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES EINZIGEN IDENTIFIKATORS | [2024/10] | English: | LOCALIZING AN AUGMENTED REALITY DEVICE USING A SINGLE IDENTIFIER | [2024/10] | French: | LOCALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE À L'AIDE D'UN IDENTIFIANT UNIQUE | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2071510 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 1 * [I] 10,11; | [A]US2018303558 (THOMAS MONROE MILAS [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0069]; figures 7-8 *; | [A]EP3751371 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0017] - paragraph [0021] * |