EP4145265 - STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daedalus Cloud LLC 75 South Riverside Avenue, Unit B Croton-on-Hudson, NY 10520 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Nyriad Inc. 3500 South DuPont Highway Dover, DE 19001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGLIS, Stuart John 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 02 /
LAMBERT, Sheridan John 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 03 /
FLEMING, Adam Gworn Kit 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 04 /
LAPIK, Dmitry 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 05 /
STOKES, Daniel James Nicholas 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 06 /
SIMMONDS, Cameron Ray 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 07 /
BALKRISHNAN, Pradeep 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 08 /
SCARAMUZZO, John Anthony 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 09 /
LAZARO, Matthew Sylvain 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 10 /
TURPITT, Jack Spencer 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 11 /
SHUKER, Rafael John Patrick 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 12 /
OUD, Leon Wiremu Macrae 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 13 /
PENNINGTON, Kevan 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 14 /
SETZ, Bernard Willis 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 15 /
CONNELL, Harrison Ian 3216 Hamilton / NZ | 16 /
HUNT, Herbert Dennis 3216 Hamilton / NZ | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22193263.5 | 31.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | US202163239571P | 01.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163239571 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4145265 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4145265 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/0635 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
G06F3/0685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/10] | English: | STORAGE SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 15.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1942405 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,7,8 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2017212891 (PUNDIR ANSHUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US10574754 (SAJEEPA PRABHATH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 6A, 6B *; | [Y]US2021157487 (GUYER JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2021263651 (SANDVIG CARY [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3A, 3C * |