EP4206631 - INFRARED SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/13] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jinmyoung Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
SONG, Byonggwon Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
YANG, Yooseong Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
LEE, Duhyun Suwon-si / KR | 05 /
LEE, Byungkyu Suwon-si / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22193402.9 | 01.09.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | KR20210194549 | 31.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210194549 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206631 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4206631 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/10 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G01J5/10 (EP);
G01J5/20 (CN,KR);
G01J5/58 (US);
G01J5/0205 (CN);
G01J5/024 (KR);
G01J5/22 (CN,KR);
H10B61/00 (KR);
H10N15/20 (US);
H10N50/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFRAROTSENSOR UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/27] | English: | INFRARED SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2023/27] | French: | CAPTEUR INFRAROUGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017160248 (ROIZIN YAKOV [IL], et al); | [A]WO2021021690 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]); | [A]US2021404867 (JAISWAL AKHILESH R [US], et al) |