EP4160430 - A SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD, APPARATUSES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A DEVICE BASED ON A READ REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAI Strategic Holdings, Inc. 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMPOLINI, Frederic Philippe North Carolina, 27106 / US | 02 /
HENRY, JR., Raymond Charles North Carolina, 27511 / US | 03 /
KIMSEY, Glen North Carolina, 27511 / US | 04 /
LAMB, Wilson Christopher North Carolina, 27278 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22193721.2 | 01.07.2015 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | US201414327776 | 10.07.2014 Original published format: US201414327776 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160430 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP,US);
A24F40/50 (KR);
A24F40/65 (EP,KR,US);
A61M15/0001 (KR);
A61M15/06 (KR);
G06F13/42 (EP);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,CN,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINER VORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS EINER LESEANFORDERUNG | [2023/14] | English: | A SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD, APPARATUSES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A DEVICE BASED ON A READ REQUEST | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET PRODUITS PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS POUR COMMANDER L'EXÉCUTION D'UNE OPÉRATION D'UN DISPOSITIF SUR LA BASE D'UNE DEMANDE DE LECTURE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15739420.6 / EP3167601 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7167943 (TASHIRO JUN [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US7500024 (PERI EYAL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 6 * * column 1, line 60 *; | [Y]US2009128301 (PARK HONG-SEOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2009320863 (FERNANDO FELIX [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US8327036 (CHAMLEY OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7217320 | US7726320 | US2013008457 | US2013213417 | US2013255702 | US2014000638 | US2014060554 |