EP4331879 - ROAD VEHICLE COMPRISING A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz Cargobull AG Siemensstraße 50 48341 Altenberge / DE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rübig, Michael 77830 Bühlertal / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22193782.4 | 02.09.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331879 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, B60H1/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B60H1/3232 (EP);
B60H1/00428 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRASSENNUTZFAHRZEUG UMFASSEND EINE TRANSPORTKÄLTEMASCHINE | [2024/10] | English: | ROAD VEHICLE COMPRISING A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATING MACHINE | [2024/10] | French: | VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE ROUTIER COMPRENANT UNE MACHINE FRIGORIFIQUE DE TRANSPORT | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003106332 (OKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011107229 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2019088942 (GENCER OTOMOTIV KARASOR VE BEYAZ ESYA SANAYI TICARET LTD SIRKETI [TR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]KR20200069964 (DAEKWANG REFRIGERATOR IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,5,9-15 * paragraphs [0048] - [0089]; figures 1-6; claims 1-7 * [A] 3 [I] 2,6,8; | [XAI]KR102162925B (DAEKWANG REFRIGERATOR IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,5,9-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0121]; figures 1-7; claim 1 * [A] 3 [I] 2,6,8 |