EP4160419 - OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY MODULE, OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY CONTROLLER, AND OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dae-Jeong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KO, Tae-Kyeong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Nam Hyung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Do-Han Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SEO, Deokho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Ho-Young Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Insu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22193862.4 | 05.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | KR20210129024 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210129024 | US202217889117 | 16.08.2022 Original published format: US202217889117 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160419 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G06F11/1048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRIEBSVERFAHREN EINES SPEICHERMODULS, BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SPEICHERSTEUERUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/14] | English: | OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY MODULE, OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY CONTROLLER, AND OPERATION METHOD OF MEMORY SYSTEM | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MODULE DE MÉMOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CONTRÔLEUR DE MÉMOIRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 13.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014006904 (GENDLER ALEXANDER [IL]) [X] 1,7-9,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2, 3, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0034]-[0036], [0037] * [Y] 2,3,12 [I] 4-6,10,13-15; | [IY]US2014281747 (MCNAIRY CAMERON B [US], et al) [I] 1,4-11,13-15 * figures 1, 5 * * paragraph [0029]-[0031] * [Y] 2,3,12; | [Y]US2016357665 (LEE HAN-JU [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3,12 * paragraph [0111], paragraph [0283] * * paragraph [0166] *; | [A]US2019227885 (MUTNURY BHYRAV M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0019] *; | [A] - Jedec, "DDR5 Full Spec Draft Rev.0.1", (20171205), URL: jedec.org, (20210203), XP055771628 [A] 1-15 * page 243, Table 81, section 4.28 * |