EP4332678 - HOLOGRAPHIC METROLOGY APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUIJS, Robin, Daniel 5500AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN SCHAIJK, Theodorus, Thomas, Marinus 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
DEN BOEF, Arie, Jeffrey 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22193868.1 | 05.09.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332678 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G03H1/04, G03H1/08 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G03H1/0443 (EP);
G03F7/706849 (EP);
G03F7/706851 (EP);
G03H1/0465 (EP);
G03H1/265 (EP);
G03H2001/0038 (EP);
G03H2001/005 (EP);
G03H2001/0445 (EP);
G03H2001/046 (EP);
G03H2001/0473 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLOGRAPHISCHES LITHOGRAPHIEGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | [2024/10] | English: | HOLOGRAPHIC METROLOGY APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2024/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉTROLOGIE HOLOGRAPHIQUE | [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US6952253 | US6961116 | US2006033921 | EP1628164 | US2006066855 | US7265364 | WO2009078708 | WO2009106279 | US7646471 | US2010201963 | US2010233600 | US2010328655 | US2011026032 | WO2011012624 | US2011027704 | US2011043791 | US2011102753 | US2011249244 | US2012044470 | US2012123581 | US2013258310 | US2013271740 | WO2013178422 | US2015261097 | US2016161864 | US2016161863 | WO2016102127 | US2016370717 | WO2019197117 | WO2021121733 | EP3964892 | US20080451599 | US20080256780 | US20090920968 | US20090922587 | US20090486449 | US20100708678 |