EP4144823 - ANTI-WEAR COMPOSITION FOR LUBRICANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Corporation 111, RIDC Park West Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15275-1112 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deblase, Frank Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | 02 /
Stieber, Joseph Prospect, Connecticut 06712 / US | 03 /
MacLeod, Kenneth Prospect, Connecticut 06712 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Siegers, Britta LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22193885.5 | 08.02.2019 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | US201862629171P | 12.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862629171 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144823 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10M129/72, C10M133/16, C10M145/22, // C10N30/06 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C10M133/16 (EP,US);
C10M129/72 (EP,US);
C10M137/10 (US);
C10M145/22 (EP);
C10M169/04 (US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2209/102 (EP);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (US);
C10N2040/25 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SCHMIERMITTEL | [2023/10] | English: | ANTI-WEAR COMPOSITION FOR LUBRICANTS | [2023/10] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTI-USURE POUR LUBRIFIANTS | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19752058.8 / EP3752588 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1450273 (NEYNABER CHEMIE GMBH) [A] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [XI]US5338470 (HIEBERT JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * (col. 1, l. 6-11; claims 1, 5, 7; col. 5, l. 8-15; col. 2, l. 49-57; col. 4, l. 31-36 * [I] 4,5; | [A]US2005198894 (MIGDAL CYRIL A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * tab. 2: ex. 1-6, 9-15, 41-43, 46-48; claims 5-6, 11-15, 18-19; par. 28, 70, 117 *; | [A]US2014057818 (BARTON WILLIAM R S [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 4-5, 10; claim 1 ** abstract *; | [A]EP3187254 (AFTON CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * example 3; table 2 * | by applicant | US5338470 | US5498809 | US7696136 |