EP4151776 - ELECTROFORMING MASTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTROFORMING MASTER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTROFORMING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEZAWA, Tomokazu Minamiashigara / JP | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22194324.4 | 07.09.2022 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | JP20210152119 | 17.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021152119 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151776 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/00, C25D1/22 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C25D1/22 (EP);
C25D1/20 (US);
C25D1/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GALVANOPLASTIK-MASTER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GALVANOPLASTIK-MASTERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GALVANOPLASTIK-MATERIALS | [2023/12] | English: | ELECTROFORMING MASTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTROFORMING MASTER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELECTROFORMING MATERIAL | [2023/12] | French: | MATRICE D'ÉLECTROFORMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATRICE D'ÉLECTROFORMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTROFORMAGE | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 09.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1510599 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,10,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018]; tables 2, 3 *; | [X]US7088116 (LIN HAIAN [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]US2009008703 (LU CHI-PIN [TW], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figure 1A *; | [A]US2010116676 (KIM SANG JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1A-1F *; | [XY]WO2013084429 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [X] 9,11 * paragraph [0005]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0078] * [Y] 2,3,10,12-14; | [Y]EP2781626 (LEAP CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,10,12-14 * paragraph [0017]; figures 6, 7 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * | by applicant | JP2005256110 | JP2007287216 |