EP4335409 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SPATIAL CURGICAL MESH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torunskie Zaklady Materialow Opatrunkowych Spolka Akcyjna ul. Zolkiewskiego 20/26 87-100 Torun / PL | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sujka, Witold 95-080 Tuszyn / PL | 02 /
Karbowski, Krzysztof 32-083 Szczyglice / PL | 03 /
Wilgocka, Karolina 98-240 Szadek / PL | 04 /
Turlakiewicz, Karolina 91-157 Lódz / PL | 05 /
Latanska, Ilona 94-104 Lódz / PL | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Bischof, Oliver Bischof & Partner Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB An den Speichern 6 48157 Münster / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22194707.0 | 08.09.2022 | [2024/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4335409 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/0063 (EP);
A61F2240/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RÄUMLICHEN CHRURISCHEN NETZES | [2024/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SPATIAL CURGICAL MESH | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN RÉSEAU CHIRURGICAL SPATIALISÉ | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 25.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0746267 (BARD INC C R [US]) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1100401 (BARD INC C R [US]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102013004574 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102013014295 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102014015179 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0746267 | EP1100401 |