EP4147841 - PRODUCTION DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR SMC PRODUCTION DEVICE, FOR PRODUCING THERMOSET SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | 15.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | 15.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt & Heinzmann GmbH & Co. KG Vichystrasse 12 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bücheler, David 76356 Weingarten / DE | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22194908.4 | 09.09.2022 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | DE202110123510 | 10.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021123510 | [2023/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147841 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29B15/12, B29C31/04, B29C70/50, B29C70/54, B05C3/18, B05C11/04, B05C11/10 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B05C3/18 (EP);
B29C70/18 (US);
B05C11/04 (EP);
B05C11/1005 (EP);
B29B15/122 (EP);
B29C70/50 (EP);
B29C70/504 (US);
B29C70/541 (US);
B29C70/546 (US);
B29C2037/90 (US);
B29C70/46 (EP);
B29K2101/10 (US);
B29K2105/0863 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] |
Former [2023/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE SMC-PRODUKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, ZU EINER HERSTELLUNG VON DUROPLASTISCHEN HALBZEUGEN | [2023/11] | English: | PRODUCTION DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR SMC PRODUCTION DEVICE, FOR PRODUCING THERMOSET SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS | [2023/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION, EN PARTICULIER DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION SMC, POUR LA PRODUCTION DE DEMI-PRODUITS THERMODURCISSABLES | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 12.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102010002844 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0044]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102010045888 (SCHMIDT & HEINZMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,9* paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO2013160290 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * page 10, line 19 - line 28; figure 4 * [A] 2-7,10 |