EP4160345 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH INDICATION OF A MECHANICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Andre Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
RAJU BK, Balasubramanya Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
SHASTRY CR, Manu Charlotte, 28202 / US | 04 /
MUNIRAJU, Raghavendra Charlotte, 28202 / US | 05 /
THOTADAKUMBRI VENKATARAO, Raviprakash Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22195032.2 | 12.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | IN202111044564 | 01.10.2021 Original published format: IN202111044564 | US202217659276 | 14.04.2022 Original published format: US202217659276 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160345 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4160345 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP);
G07C5/0808 (US);
G05B23/0283 (EP);
H02J50/001 (EP);
H02J7/34 (EP);
G05B2219/2637 (EP);
H02N2/188 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER GESUNDHEITSANZEIGE EINER MECHANISCHEN KOMPONENTE | [2023/14] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH INDICATION OF A MECHANICAL COMPONENT | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER UNE INDICATION DE SANTÉ D'UN COMPOSANT MÉCANIQUE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 15.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24171579.6 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008036617 (ARMS STEVEN W [US], et al); | [IY]US9791910 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2021123835 (GLENNON GREG A [US], et al) |