EP4159224 - SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING CHRONIC INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engels, Eefje 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
van Limpt, Cornelus Johannes Petrus 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
Oosting, Annemarie 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 04 /
Oozeer, Akhtar Raish 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 05 /
Knol, Jan 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 06 /
Mischke, Mona 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22195122.1 | 29.06.2018 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | EP20170179070 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17179070 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159224 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/745, A61K9/00, A61K31/715, A23L33/00, A23L33/135, A23L33/21, A61P3/10, A61P29/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61K35/745 (EP,US);
A23L3/00 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | SYNBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG VON CHRONISCHER ENTZÜNDUNG | [2023/14] | English: | SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING CHRONIC INFLAMMATION | [2023/14] | French: | COMPOSITION SYMBIOTIQUE DE PRÉVENTION DE L'INFLAMMATION CHRONIQUE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18733319.0 / EP3645023 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2006091103 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-3,5-10 * page 14; claims 1,13,16 *; | [Y]WO2008116700 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-11 *; | [XI]WO2008153377 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 19; example 2 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2009144137 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * claims 1-3,8-16 * [I] 4; | [Y]EP2143341 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1,15,17 *; | [Y]WO2011012655 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 8; claims 1,5,6,8,17 *; | [Y]EP2359838 (ARAGAN [FR]) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [0050] , [0072]; claim 14 *; | [XI]WO2011149335 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * example 1; table 1 * [I] 4; | [Y]EP2452571 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0037]; claims 4,7,17-19 *; | [Y]WO2013054002 (GUT GUIDE OY [FI]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0018]; example 3; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2015172191 (MEDLAB IP PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0127] , [0129] , [0136]; claims 3-6 *; | [Y]WO2016020495 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * page 18, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,8,10 *; | [Y]WO2016026684 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO2017043962 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [X] 1-10 * example 1; claims 1,3,9 *; | [Y]WO2017043963 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [YP]WO2017129649 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [YP] 1-10 * claims 10,18 *; | [X] - KUITUNEN M ET AL, "Probiotics prevent IgE-associated allergy until age 5 years in cesarean-delivered children but not in the total cohort", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 123, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JACI.2008.11.019, ISSN 0091-6749, (20090201), pages 335 - 341, (20090108), XP025907147 [X] 1-5,8 * page 335 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2008.11.019 | by applicant | WO2004093899 | WO2006091103 | WO2007073194 | US7410653 | WO2011096808 | US9480670 | - STACKEBRANDTGOEBEL, Int. J. Syst. Bacteriol., (19940000), vol. 44, pages 846 - 849 | - L. PROSKY et al., J. Assoc. Off. Anal. Chem., (19880000), vol. 71, pages 1017 - 1023 | - SWINBURN et al., Prev Med, (19990000), vol. 29, pages 563 - 570 |