EP4338773 - DRUG SUPPLY UNIT FOR INHALATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Activoris Medizintechnik GmbH Wohraer Strasse 37 35285 Gemünden (Wohra) / DE | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunne, Stephen T. Porto 4150-044 / PT | 02 /
Fischer, Axel 34630 Gilserberg / DE | 03 /
Kolb, Tobias 82061 Neuried / DE | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22195704.6 | 14.09.2022 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338773 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M15/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M15/0036 (EP);
A61M15/004 (EP);
A61M2202/0468 (EP);
A61M2205/276 (EP);
A61M2205/6018 (EP);
A61M2205/6036 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/43] |
Former [2024/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELABGABEEINHEIT FÜR EINE INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/12] | English: | DRUG SUPPLY UNIT FOR INHALATION DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN MÉDICAMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6145703 (OPPERMAN NICHOLAS RICHARD JAME [GB]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document, and especially figures 5-6 * [A] 4-6; | [XA]US2007076067 (HAMANO SOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document, and especially figures 1 to 4 * [A] 5; | [A]US2015352301 (STEDMAN BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document, and especially the figures *; | [XA]US2019388627 (KERN STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document, and especially figures 1 and 4 * [A] 5,6; | [XA]WO2020097085 (JUUL LABS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document, and especially figures 2 to 4 * [A] 5,6; | [XA]WO2021069972 (ROCKET SCIENCE HEALTH CORP [CA]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document, and especially the penultimate sentence of paragraph [00211] and figure 76D * [A] 4-6; | [XA]WO2022101851 (SIPNOSE LTD [IL]) [X] 1 * the whole document, and especially figures 6A-6E * [A] 2-6 | by applicant | WO2016012102 |