EP4122795 - APPARATUS FOR WEED CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassfeld, Hinnerk 49536 Lienen / DE | 02 /
Arians, Thomas 41569 Rommerskirchen / DE | 03 /
Day, Pascal 69004 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Giraud, Virginie 69130 Ecully / FR | 05 /
Hadlow, James Newmarket, CB8 9DJ / GB | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 22196145.1 | 02.07.2018 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | EP20170180030 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17180030 | EP20170181582 | 17.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17181582 | EP20170186467 | 16.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17186467 | EP20170187259 | 22.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17187259 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122795 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B61L23/04, G06Q50/02 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A01M21/043 (EP,KR,US);
A01M7/00 (US);
A01M7/0014 (KR);
A01M7/0042 (KR);
A01M7/0089 (KR);
B05B1/16 (KR);
B05B12/122 (KR);
B05B13/005 (KR);
E01H11/00 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06Q50/02 (EP,KR);
G06T7/0008 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V20/188 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N7/18 (KR);
G06T2207/30188 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG | [2023/04] | English: | APPARATUS FOR WEED CONTROL | [2023/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE LUTTE CONTRE LES MAUVAISES HERBES | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 24.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18735312.3 / EP3648591 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015027040 (REDDEN LEE [US]); | [I]WO2016191825 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]); |