EP4151467 - BODY PANEL COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPmobility SE 19 boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/31] | For all designated states OPmobility SE 19, boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium SE 19 Boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNET, Olivier 01150 SAINTE-JULIE / FR | 02 /
KHAYAT, Issam 01150 SAINTE-JULIE / FR | 03 /
YILMAZ, Marie 01150 SAINTE-JULIE / FR | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22196217.8 | 16.09.2022 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | FR20210009816 | 17.09.2021 Original published format: FR 2109816 | [2023/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151467 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, F21S41/14, F21S41/20, F21S41/40, G02B3/00, G02B19/00, G03B21/00, G03B21/14, G03B29/00, B60K35/00, G03B21/62, B60R13/04 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
B60R13/04 (EP);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60Q1/5035 (EP);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
G03B21/62 (EP);
G03B29/00 (EP);
B60K2360/27 (EP);
B60K2360/334 (EP);
B60K2360/693 (EP);
B60K2360/797 (EP);
B60K2360/84 (EP);
B60K2360/96 (EP);
G03B21/10 (EP);
G03B21/2033 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAROSSERIEPANEEL, DAS EINE BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UMFASST | [2023/12] | English: | BODY PANEL COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING IMAGES | [2023/12] | French: | PANNEAU DE CARROSSERIE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 20.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017297502 (KIM RICHARD S [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP3279135 (LINDE MATERIAL HANDLING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE102018206087 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-18 * |