EP4338655 - CUSTOMIZING INTRAOCULAR LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ligi Tecnologie Medicali S.r.l. via Luigi Corsi, 50 74100 Taranto / IT | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'IPPOLITO, Giuseppe 74121 Taranto / IT | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22196223.6 | 16.09.2022 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338655 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61F2/16 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61B3/0025 (EP);
A61F2/16 (EP,US);
A61B3/102 (US);
A61F2250/0001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG VON INTRAOKULARLINSEN | [2024/12] | English: | CUSTOMIZING INTRAOCULAR LENSES | [2024/12] | French: | PERSONNALISATION DE LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES | [2024/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012044454 (CANOVAS VIDAL CARMEN [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,11,13,15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] *; | [X]US2014192317 (BÜHREN TOBIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061] *; | [X]US2014327884 (BÜHREN TOBIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,15 * paragraph [0037] *; | [A] - JENS EINIGHAMMER ET AL, "Calculating Intraocular Lens Geometry by Real Ray Tracing", JOURNAL OF REFRACTIVE SURGERY, US, (20070401), vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.3928/1081-597X-20070401-12, ISSN 1081-597X, pages 393 - 404, XP055751121 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3928/1081-597X-20070401-12 |