EP4322046 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A PROCESSING LOGIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR SAHA, Barun 713212 Durgapur / IN | 02 /
HAAB, Luca 3018 Bern / CH | 03 /
TANDUR, Deepaknath 560068 Bangalore / IN | [2024/17] |
Former [2024/07] | 01 /
KUMAR SAHA, Barun 713212 West Bengal / IN | ||
02 /
HAAB, Luca 3018 Bern / CH | |||
03 /
TANDUR, Deepaknath 560068 Akshaya Nagar, Bangalore / IN | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22196465.3 | 20.09.2022 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | IN202241045145 | 08.08.2022 Original published format: IN202241045145 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322046 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/30, G06F8/30, // G06F40/284 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G06F40/30 (EP);
G06F8/30 (EP);
G06F40/284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER VERARBEITUNGSLOGIK | [2024/07] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A PROCESSING LOGIC | [2024/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE LOGIQUE DE TRAITEMENT | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2016219078 (PORRAS PHILLIP A [US], et al) [I] 12,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0029] - [0032]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0070]; figure 4a * * paragraphs [0077] - [0079] - [0 81] , [0084] - [0090]; figure 4b * * paragraphs [0097] - [0100]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0112]; figure 6a * * paragraphs [0115] - [0117]; figure 6b * [A] 1-11,14,15; | [IA]US2021264111 (ADITYA SOMAK [IN], et al) [I] 1-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0015] , [0 20] , [0021] , [0028] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0051]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0053] - [0061] - [0063]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0065] , [0067] - [0074]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0077] - [0090]; figures 6-7 * [A] 12,13; | [IA] - NGUYEN MANH-TIEN-ANH ET AL, "When NLP meets SDN : an application to Global Internet eXchange Network", ICC 2022 - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE, (20220516), doi:10.1109/ICC45855.2022.9838633, pages 2972 - 2977, XP034167314 [I] 12,13 * abstract * * section I * * section III;; figures 1,2,3,4,5 * * section IV * [A] 1-11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC45855.2022.9838633 | [IA] - SAHA BARUN KUMAR ET AL, "Intent-based Industrial Network Management Using Natural Language Instructions", 2022 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRONICS, COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES (CONECCT), IEEE, (20220708), doi:10.1109/CONECCT55679.2022.9865738, pages 1 - 6, XP034177322 [I] 12,13 * abstract * * section I * * sections III, IV, V, VI;; figures 2-6; table II * [A] 1-11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CONECCT55679.2022.9865738 | [T] - SAHA BARUN KUMAR ET AL, "A Natural Language Understanding Approach Toward Extraction of Specifications from Request for Proposals", 2023 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE IN INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION (ICAIIC), IEEE, (20230220), doi:10.1109/ICAIIC57133.2023.10067032, pages 205 - 210, XP034314313 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICAIIC57133.2023.10067032 |