EP4159634 - OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE, MOLD FOR MOLDING AN OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE AND PACKAGE HAVING AN OPENING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANON, Paolo 41122 Modena / IT | 02 /
MARTINI, Pietro 43122 Parma / IT | 03 /
VIETRI, Anna Rosa 41122 Modena / IT | 04 /
DE PAOLA, Rocco 41122 Modena / IT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22196515.5 | 20.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | EP20210200038 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21200038 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159634 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4159634 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29L31/56, B65D5/74, B29C37/00, B29C45/14 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B65D5/749 (EP);
B29C37/0057 (EP);
B29C45/14344 (EP);
B29L2031/565 (EP);
B65D2251/0015 (EP);
B65D2251/0087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | B65D5/74, B65D47/10, B29C37/00, B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERPACKUNG, FORM ZUM FORMEN EINER ÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERPACKUNG UND VERPACKUNG MIT EINER ÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/14] | English: | OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE, MOLD FOR MOLDING AN OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE AND PACKAGE HAVING AN OPENING DEVICE | [2023/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE POUR UN EMBALLAGE, MOULE POUR MOULER UN DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE POUR UN EMBALLAGE ET EMBALLAGE DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0125106 (ARGO SA PLASTIC PACKAGING MATE [GR], et al); | [A]JP2007223668 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [A]JP2014084141 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]US2017327276 (MARTINI PIETRO [IT], et al); | [Y]US2019359370 (WINBERG PETRA [SE], et al) | Examination | EP2955122 |