EP4122898 - HEAT TREATABLE COATED ARTICLE HAVING TITANIUM NITRIDE BASED IR REFLECTING LAYER(S) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guardian Glass, LLC 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills MI 48326-1714 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Yiwei Ann Arbor / US | 02 /
LINGLE, Philip, J. Temperance / US | 03 /
TUCKER, Patricia Lambertville / US | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22196717.7 | 04.01.2018 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | US201715398913 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: US201715398913 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122898 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/34 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C03C17/3435 (EP,RU,US);
C03C17/225 (US);
C03B27/012 (US);
C03C17/34 (RU);
C03C17/3429 (RU);
C23C14/0652 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDELBARER BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL MIT IR-REFLEXIONSSCHICHT(EN) AUF TITANNITRIDBASIS | [2023/04] | English: | HEAT TREATABLE COATED ARTICLE HAVING TITANIUM NITRIDE BASED IR REFLECTING LAYER(S) | [2023/04] | French: | ARTICLE REVÊTU POUVANT ÊTRE TRAITÉ THERMIQUEMENT, PRÉSENTANT AU MOINS UNE COUCHE RÉFLÉCHISSANT LES INFRAROUGES, À BASE DE NITRURE DE TITANE | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 25.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18709118.6 / EP3565791 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH05124839 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [I] 1-7 * example 4; table 1 *; | [XI]US2002192473 (GENTILHOMME CAROLE [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * example 5; table 3 *[I] 7; | [XI]US2003203215 (SHIMATANI NARUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 12,13; table 2 * [I] 7; | [XI]US2007056961 (SHIMATANI NARUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 21-24 * [I] 7 | by applicant | US2012177899 | US8286395 |